House | 05/22/2015 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 4213 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4213 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2110 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1202 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1139 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1139 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1139 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1139 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1139 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1139 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1139 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 437 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 437 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |