E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3102
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4688
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1523
|
Journal Page: 4688
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4688
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 4687
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4687
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4535
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4535
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3135
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1580
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 927
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Garcia
|
Journal Page: 805
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 805
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 805
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 816
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 757
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 707
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 437
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 437
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|