Senate | 05/05/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Companion document considered in lieu of | HB 40 | Journal Page: 1287 |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 693 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 616 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 440 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 440 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |