E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
August 31, 2015
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3643
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3616
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5740
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1768
|
Journal Page: 5739
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5739
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 3466
|
Journal Page: 5737
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6022
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3501
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3501
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1059
|
Journal Page: 3501
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3406
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4935
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4935
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4760
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4760
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4760
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2030
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1263
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2297
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#513
|
Journal Page: 2296
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2296
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2296
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2233
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2233
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2233
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 2183
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2183
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 2848
|
Journal Page: 2183
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1751
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1498
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 758
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 639
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 442
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 442
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|