Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1192 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1192
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2015; March 17, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 29, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 29, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1192 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the confidentiality of certain information stored as
 part of the preparation of reports and personal financial
 statements required to be filed with the Texas Ethics Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 571.0671, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Electronic report or financial statement data saved in a
 commission temporary storage location for later retrieval and
 editing before the report or financial statement is filed is
 confidential and may not be disclosed. After the report or
 financial statement is filed with the commission, the information
 disclosed in the filed report or financial statement is public
 information to the extent provided by the law requiring the filing
 of the report or financial statement.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *