Senate | 05/14/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1547 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 132 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 132 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |