House | 05/20/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Referred to Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 3675 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3675 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3263 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1585 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1516 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1516 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1516 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1515 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1515 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1515 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 446 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 446 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |