Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1230 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 84R1571 CAE-F
22 By: Creighton S.B. No. 1230
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to the availability of certain school district financial
88 information on certain districts' Internet websites.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. Chapter 44, Education Code, is amended by adding
1111 Subchapter D to read as follows:
1212 SUBCHAPTER D. FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE
1313 Sec. 44.101. APPLICABILITY. This subchapter applies only
1414 to a school district that is ranked among the 50 highest in student
1515 enrollment, as determined by the commissioner.
1616 Sec. 44.102. ELECTRONIC CHECKING ACCOUNT TRANSACTION
1717 REGISTER. (a) A school district shall maintain the transaction
1818 register for the district's checking account in a searchable
1919 electronic spreadsheet format, such as a portable document format
2020 (PDF) or similar file type, in which the transaction register is
2121 readily available for purposes of Subsections (e) and (f). Except
2222 as provided by Subsection (c) or (d), the electronic checking
2323 account transaction register must include for each check written
2424 from a district checking account:
2525 (1) the transaction amount;
2626 (2) the name of the payee; and
2727 (3) either:
2828 (A) a statement of the purpose of the expenditure
2929 for which the check was written; or
3030 (B) identification of the purpose of the
3131 expenditure, using the function code assigned to the expenditure
3232 for purposes of meeting state reporting requirements.
3333 (a-1) Notwithstanding Subsection (a), beginning September
3434 1, 2015, a school district's electronic checking account
3535 transaction register must contain the information required by
3636 Subsections (a)(1) and (2) for each check dated on or after August
3737 1, 2015. Beginning September 1, 2016, a district's electronic
3838 checking account transaction register must contain the information
3939 required by Subsections (a)(1) through (3) for each check dated on
4040 or after August 1, 2016. This subsection expires October 1, 2016.
4141 (b) If the school district complies with Subsection (a)(3)
4242 in the manner provided by Subsection (a)(3)(B), the district shall
4343 post on the district's Internet website:
4444 (1) a description of each function code used for state
4545 reporting requirements; or
4646 (2) a link to a page on the agency's Internet website
4747 that describes each function code used for state reporting
4848 requirements.
4949 (c) A school district may not include in the district's
5050 electronic checking account transaction register a check issued to
5151 a district employee in payment of:
5252 (1) salary, wages, or an employment stipend; or
5353 (2) a workers' compensation income benefit, medical
5454 benefit, death benefit, or burial benefit that is issued by a school
5555 district operating as a self-insurer under Chapter 504, Labor Code.
5656 (d) This section does not apply to a checking account
5757 maintained by a school district or school campus solely for a
5858 student activity fund.
5959 (e) A school district shall prominently post the electronic
6060 checking account transaction register at all times on the
6161 district's Internet website for viewing and downloading by
6262 interested persons.
6363 (f) A school district shall share data from the electronic
6464 checking account transaction register with any interested person
6565 who requests the data.
6666 (g) A school district shall:
6767 (1) update the electronic checking account
6868 transaction register at least once each month, not later than the
6969 30th day after the closing date of the most recent monthly statement
7070 for the checking account; and
7171 (2) maintain each transaction or listing in the
7272 electronic checking account transaction register on the district's
7373 Internet website until the second anniversary of the date of the
7474 transaction or listing.
7575 Sec. 44.103. POSTING OF DISTRICT CREDIT CARD TRANSACTIONS.
7676 (a) A school district shall post on the district's Internet website
7777 a monthly listing of each transaction made using a credit card
7878 issued to:
7979 (1) the district; or
8080 (2) a district officer or employee for use in
8181 connection with district business.
8282 (b) The listing of credit card transactions under
8383 Subsection (a) must include, for each transaction:
8484 (1) the month and year of the transaction;
8585 (2) the amount of the transaction; and
8686 (3) the name of the payee.
8787 (c) A school district may comply with Subsection (a) by
8888 posting a credit card statement on the district's Internet website.
8989 Before posting a credit card statement as permitted by this
9090 subsection, a school district shall remove or obliterate:
9191 (1) the name of the credit card issuer;
9292 (2) the credit card number;
9393 (3) the name of the person to whom the card is issued;
9494 (4) the day of the month on which each transaction
9595 shown was made; and
9696 (5) the expiration date of the credit card.
9797 (d) A school district shall:
9898 (1) post each credit card transaction not later than
9999 the 30th day after the first date the district pays any portion of
100100 the balance due shown on the credit card statement that contains the
101101 transaction; and
102102 (2) maintain the listing of a credit card transaction
103103 on the district's Internet website until the second anniversary of
104104 the date of the transaction.
105105 (e) A school district shall post on the district's Internet
106106 website the first monthly listing of credit card transactions by
107107 listing each transaction on the first monthly statement the
108108 district receives that covers a billing period that ends after
109109 August 1, 2015. This subsection expires December 1, 2015.
110110 Sec. 44.104. POSTING OF DISTRICT EMPLOYEE COMPENSATION
111111 INFORMATION. (a) In this section, "compensation" means salaries,
112112 wages, and employment stipends.
113113 (b) Not later than the 30th day after the date the agency
114114 posts the information submitted by the district under the Public
115115 Education Information Management System (PEIMS), a school district
116116 shall post on the district's Internet website a listing of the total
117117 amounts budgeted for district employees' compensation for the
118118 school year, grouped by the following categories of employees:
119119 (1) prekindergarten and kindergarten teachers;
120120 (2) elementary school teachers other than those listed
121121 in Subdivision (1);
122122 (3) secondary school teachers;
123123 (4) special education teachers;
124124 (5) educational supervisors;
125125 (6) counselors;
126126 (7) educational diagnosticians;
127127 (8) librarians;
128128 (9) nurses and physicians;
129129 (10) therapists;
130130 (11) psychologists and associate psychologists;
131131 (12) educational support personnel other than those
132132 listed in Subdivisions (5) through (11);
133133 (13) administrative or instructional officers;
134134 (14) principals;
135135 (15) assistant principals;
136136 (16) superintendents;
137137 (17) assistant superintendents;
138138 (18) educational aides; and
139139 (19) all other employees.
140140 (c) For each category of employees under Subsection (b), the
141141 district shall post:
142142 (1) the number of full-time employees; and
143143 (2) the average compensation.
144144 (d) A school district shall maintain the employee
145145 compensation information for a school year on the district's
146146 Internet website until the district posts the information for the
147147 following school year.
148148 Sec. 44.105. POSTING OF DISTRICT FUND BALANCES. (a) A
149149 school district shall post on the district's Internet website a
150150 statement of the district's obligated and unobligated fund
151151 balances.
152152 (b) A school district shall:
153153 (1) update the statement of fund balances at least
154154 once each month; and
155155 (2) maintain each statement of fund balances on the
156156 district's Internet website until the second anniversary of the
157157 date of the statement.
158158 (c) A school district should maintain minimum fund balances
159159 equal to at least two months of the district's operating budget.
160160 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
161161 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
162162 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
163163 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
164164 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.