House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4343
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 3262
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3262
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2830
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1445
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1378
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1378
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1378
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1055
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 447
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 447
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|