LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1243
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1243
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1243
Compare Versions
SB1243 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1243 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1243 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB1243 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
SB1243 Engrossed April 29, 2015
SB1243 Comm Sub April 16, 2015
SB1243 Introduced March 11, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB1243 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1243 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1243 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB1243 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
SB1243 Engrossed April 29, 2015
SB1243 Comm Sub April 16, 2015
SB1243 Introduced March 11, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare