E | 05/19/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1723 | |
E | 05/07/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1438 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2807 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1400 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1438 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1351 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2480 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Record vote | RV#592 | Journal Page: 2482 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2482 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2482 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2462 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2462 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1990 | Journal Page: 2462 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2451 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 2003 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2003 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1495 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 449 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 449 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |