Senate | 04/13/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 483 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 483 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |