Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1294 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Nichols S.B. No. 1294
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2; April 20, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1294 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain limitations on design-build contracts for
 transportation infrastructure projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 223.241, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subdivision (3) to read as follows:
 (3)  "Highway project" means a single facility between
 two defined points in a highway corridor.
 SECTION 2.  Section 223.242, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsections (b-1), (f), and (g) and amending Subsections
 (d) and (d-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A design-build contract under this subchapter may
 include a maintenance agreement requiring a design-build
 contractor to maintain a project for an initial term of not longer
 than five years.  The maintenance agreement may authorize the
 department, in its sole discretion, to exercise options extending
 the term of the maintenance agreement for additional periods beyond
 the initial maintenance term with each additional period being not
 longer than five years.  The department shall obtain pricing for the
 maintenance work for each maintenance term. The department may
 require separate pricing for the maintenance work to be performed
 for each year of a maintenance term.
 (d)  The department may enter into a design-build contract
 for a highway project with a construction cost estimate of $250
 [$50] million or more to the department.
 (d-1)  The department may not enter into more than three
 contracts under this section in each fiscal year.  [This subsection
 expires August 31, 2015.]
 (f)  The department shall not use the design-build method for
 the construction, expansion, extension, rehabilitation,
 alteration, or repair of a highway project if the project is
 substantially designed by the department or another entity other
 than the design-build contractor.
 (g)  The department shall not include more than one highway
 project in a design-build contract.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Section 223.242(b-1), Transportation Code,
 as added by this Act, applies only to a contract entered into on or
 after the effective date of this Act. A contract entered into
 before that date is governed by the law as it existed on the date the
 contract was entered into, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 (b)  Sections 223.242(f) and (g), Transportation Code, as
 added by this Act, apply only to a highway project for which a
 request for qualifications is issued on or after the effective date
 of this Act. A highway project for which a request for
 qualifications is issued before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the request for
 qualifications was issued, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the
 legislative session.
 * * * * *