Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1302 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 27, 2015      TO: Honorable Larry Taylor, Chair, Senate Committee on Education      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1302 by Menéndez (Relating to limiting certain state-required assessment instruments administered to public school students in certain grades to assessments required by federal law.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1302, As Introduced: a positive impact of $18,300,000 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 27, 2015





  TO: Honorable Larry Taylor, Chair, Senate Committee on Education      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1302 by Menéndez (Relating to limiting certain state-required assessment instruments administered to public school students in certain grades to assessments required by federal law.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Larry Taylor, Chair, Senate Committee on Education
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB1302 by Menéndez (Relating to limiting certain state-required assessment instruments administered to public school students in certain grades to assessments required by federal law.), As Introduced

 Honorable Larry Taylor, Chair, Senate Committee on Education 

 Honorable Larry Taylor, Chair, Senate Committee on Education 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB1302 by Menéndez (Relating to limiting certain state-required assessment instruments administered to public school students in certain grades to assessments required by federal law.), As Introduced

SB1302 by Menéndez (Relating to limiting certain state-required assessment instruments administered to public school students in certain grades to assessments required by federal law.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1302, As Introduced: a positive impact of $18,300,000 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1302, As Introduced: a positive impact of $18,300,000 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2016 $9,150,000   2017 $9,150,000   2018 $9,150,000   2019 $9,150,000   2020 $9,150,000    


2016 $9,150,000
2017 $9,150,000
2018 $9,150,000
2019 $9,150,000
2020 $9,150,000

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2016 $9,150,000   2017 $9,150,000   2018 $9,150,000   2019 $9,150,000   2020 $9,150,000   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2016 $9,150,000   2017 $9,150,000   2018 $9,150,000   2019 $9,150,000   2020 $9,150,000  


2016 $9,150,000
2017 $9,150,000
2018 $9,150,000
2019 $9,150,000
2020 $9,150,000

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would require the Texas Education Agency (TEA) to develop appropriate assessment instruments only for subjects and grades for which an assessment is required by federal law. The bill would take effect September 1, 2015, or immediately if passed with the necessary voting margins, and apply beginning in school year 2015-16. 

Methodology

Developing assessment instruments only for subjects and grades for which an assessment is required by federal law would reduce the number of assessments and result in savings of approximately $9.2 million annually, based on the costs of the current state assessment contract which expires August 31, 2015.Based on information provided by TEA, the grade 4 and 7 writing assessment and grade 8 social studies assessment are not required by federal law and would be eliminated. According to TEA, the estimated savings of eliminating the writing assessments would be $4.2 million per fiscal year for grade 4 and $3.7 million per fiscal year for the grade 7. The estimated savings of eliminating the grade eight social studies assessment would be $1.25 million per fiscal year.This analysis assumes savings based on the per assessment costs of the current state assessmentcontract. To the extent that assessment costs change with a new contract, savings may vary.

Local Government Impact

School districts would experience varying savings from administering a reduced number of assessments.

Source Agencies: 701 Central Education Agency

701 Central Education Agency

LBB Staff: UP, JBi, AM, AW

 UP, JBi, AM, AW