E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2668
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1556
|
Journal Page: 4816
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4816
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4816
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4790
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4790
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1171
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1171
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1171
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1171
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1171
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1171
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1171
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1199
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 758
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 485
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 485
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|