8 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 5 | | relating to the establishment of a Junior Reserve Officer Training |
---|
10 | 6 | | Corps teaching certificate and eligibility of such certified |
---|
11 | 7 | | teacher for other educator certification. |
---|
12 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 21, Education Code, is |
---|
14 | 10 | | amended by adding Section 21.0487 to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 11 | | Sec. 21.0487. JUNIOR RESERVE OFFICER TRAINING CORPS TEACHER |
---|
16 | 12 | | CERTIFICATION. (a) The board shall establish a standard Junior |
---|
17 | 13 | | Reserve Officer Training Corps teaching certificate to provide |
---|
18 | 14 | | Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps instruction. |
---|
19 | 15 | | (b) To be eligible for a certificate under this section, a |
---|
20 | 16 | | person must: |
---|
21 | 17 | | (1) hold a bachelor's degree from an institution of |
---|
22 | 18 | | higher education that is, and at the time the person received the |
---|
23 | 19 | | degree was, accredited or otherwise approved by an accrediting |
---|
24 | 20 | | organization recognized by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating |
---|
25 | 21 | | Board; |
---|
26 | 22 | | (2) satisfy the eligibility and testing requirements |
---|
27 | 23 | | for certification as a Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps |
---|
28 | 24 | | instructor established by the branch of service in which the person |
---|
29 | 25 | | served; and |
---|
30 | 26 | | (3) complete an approved educator preparation |
---|
31 | 27 | | program. |
---|
32 | 28 | | (c) The board shall propose rules to: |
---|
33 | 29 | | (1) approve educator preparation programs to prepare a |
---|
34 | 30 | | person as a teacher for certification under this section; and |
---|
35 | 31 | | (2) establish requirements under which: |
---|
36 | 32 | | (A) a person's training and experience acquired |
---|
37 | 33 | | during the person's military service serves as proof of the person's |
---|
38 | 34 | | demonstration of subject matter knowledge if that training and |
---|
39 | 35 | | experience is verified by the branch of service in which the person |
---|
40 | 36 | | served; and |
---|
41 | 37 | | (B) a person's employment by a school district as |
---|
42 | 38 | | a Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps instructor before the |
---|
43 | 39 | | person was enrolled in an educator preparation program or while the |
---|
44 | 40 | | person is enrolled in an educator preparation program is applied to |
---|
45 | 41 | | satisfy any student teaching, internship, or field-based |
---|
46 | 42 | | experience program requirement. |
---|
47 | 43 | | (d) A person is not required to hold a certificate |
---|
48 | 44 | | established under this section to be employed by a school district |
---|
49 | 45 | | as a Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps instructor. |
---|
50 | 46 | | SECTION 2. Section 21.046, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
51 | 47 | | adding Subsection (e) to read as follows: |
---|
52 | 48 | | (e) For purposes of satisfying eligibility requirements for |
---|
53 | 49 | | certification as a principal, a teacher who is certified under |
---|
54 | 50 | | Section 21.0487: |
---|
55 | 51 | | (1) is considered to hold a classroom teaching |
---|
56 | 52 | | certificate; and |
---|
57 | 53 | | (2) may apply as creditable years of teaching |
---|
58 | 54 | | experience as a classroom teacher any period during which the |
---|
59 | 55 | | teacher was employed by a school district as a Junior Reserve |
---|
60 | 56 | | Officer Training Corps instructor before or after the teacher was |
---|
61 | 57 | | certified under Section 21.0487. |
---|
62 | 58 | | SECTION 3. Not later than January 1, 2016, the State Board |
---|
63 | 59 | | for Educator Certification shall propose rules relating to the |
---|
64 | 60 | | establishment of a Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps teaching |
---|
65 | 61 | | certificate as provided by Section 21.0487, Education Code, as |
---|
66 | 62 | | added by this Act. |
---|
67 | 63 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
68 | 64 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
69 | 65 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
70 | 66 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
71 | 67 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
| 68 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 69 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 70 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1309 passed the Senate on |
---|
| 71 | + | April 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that |
---|
| 72 | + | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2015, by the |
---|
| 73 | + | following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
| 74 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 75 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 76 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1309 passed the House, with |
---|
| 77 | + | amendment, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 143, |
---|
| 78 | + | Nays 1, two present not voting. |
---|
| 79 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 80 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 81 | + | Approved: |
---|
| 82 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 83 | + | Date |
---|
| 84 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 85 | + | Governor |
---|