LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1316
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1316
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1316
Compare Versions
SB1316 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1316 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1316 Enrolled June 1, 2015
SB1316 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
SB1316 Engrossed May 13, 2015
SB1316 Comm Sub May 6, 2015
SB1316 Introduced March 11, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB1316 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1316 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1316 Enrolled June 1, 2015
SB1316 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
SB1316 Engrossed May 13, 2015
SB1316 Comm Sub May 6, 2015
SB1316 Introduced March 11, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare