E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3622
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5695
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3480
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3480
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3480
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3480
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2668
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1556
|
Journal Page: 4816
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4816
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4816
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4791
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Amended
|
1-D. Miller
|
Journal Page: 4791
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4791
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4343
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3896
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 3262
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3262
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2830
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1445
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1423
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1423
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1423
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1422
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1422
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1422
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1422
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Menndez
|
Journal Page: 1420
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1420
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1420
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|