Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1317 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/30/2015

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1317
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 30, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 30, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution of the offense of improper photography
 or visual recording.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 21.15(a) and (b), Penal Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Female breast" means any portion of the female
 breast below the top of the areola.
 (2)  "Intimate area" means the naked or
 undergarment-clad genitals, pubic area, anus, buttocks, or female
 breast of a person.
 (3)  "Place in which a person has a reasonable
 expectation of privacy" means a place in which a reasonable person
 would believe that the person could disrobe in privacy, without
 being concerned that the act of undressing would be photographed or
 filmed by another.
 (4)  "Promote"[, "promote"] has the meaning assigned by
 Section 43.21.
 (b)  A person commits an offense if, without the other
 person's consent and with intent to invade the privacy of the other
 person, the person:
 (1)  photographs or by videotape or other electronic
 means records, broadcasts, or transmits a visual image of an
 intimate area of another person under circumstances in which the
 other person has a reasonable expectation of privacy, regardless of
 whether the other person is in a public or private place; [another
 at a location that is not a bathroom or private dressing room:
 [(A)  without the other person's consent; and
 [(B)     with intent to arouse or gratify the sexual
 desire of any person;]
 (2)  photographs or by videotape or other electronic
 means records, broadcasts, or transmits a visual image of another
 person in a place in which the other person has a reasonable
 expectation of privacy [another at a location that is a bathroom or
 private dressing room:
 [(A)  without the other person's consent; and
 [(B)  with intent to:
 [(i)     invade the privacy of the other
 person; or
 [(ii)     arouse or gratify the sexual desire
 of any person]; or
 (3)  knowing the character and content of the
 photograph, recording, broadcast, or transmission, promotes a
 photograph, recording, broadcast, or transmission described by
 Subdivision (1) or (2).
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *