E | 05/21/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/21/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1851 | |
E | 05/11/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1505 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3107 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1495 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1445 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1398 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2512 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Record vote | RV#622 | Journal Page: 2512 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2512 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2512 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2409 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2409 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 2825 | Journal Page: 2409 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2451 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 2003 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2003 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1943 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1127 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1071 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1071 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1071 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1071 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1071 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1071 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1071 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 695 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 489 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 489 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |