Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1355 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1355
22 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
33 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
44 May 12, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5- Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2015,
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2015,
66 sent to printer.)
77 Click here to see the committee vote
88 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1355 By: Whitmire
99
1010
1111 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1212 AN ACT
1313 relating to compensation and leave for certain peace officers.
1414 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1515 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 5, Alcoholic Beverage
1616 Code, is amended by adding Section 5.21 to read as follows:
1717 Sec. 5.21. DONATION OF ACCRUED COMPENSATORY TIME OR ACCRUED
1818 ANNUAL LEAVE FOR LEGISLATIVE PURPOSES. (a) The administrator
1919 shall allow a peace officer employed by the commission to
2020 voluntarily transfer to a legislative leave pool up to eight hours
2121 of compensatory time or annual leave per year earned by the peace
2222 officer.
2323 (b) The administrator or the administrator's designee shall
2424 administer the legislative leave pool.
2525 (c) The commission shall adopt rules and prescribe
2626 procedures relating to the operation of the legislative leave pool.
2727 (d) The administrator or the administrator's designee shall
2828 credit the legislative leave pool with the amount of time
2929 contributed by a peace officer and deduct a corresponding amount of
3030 time from the peace officer's earned compensatory time or annual
3131 leave as if the peace officer had used the time for personal
3232 purposes.
3333 (e) A peace officer is entitled to use time contributed to
3434 the legislative leave pool if the peace officer uses the time for
3535 legislative leave on behalf of a law enforcement association of at
3636 least 50 active or retired members governed by a board of directors.
3737 (f) The administrator or the administrator's designee shall
3838 transfer time from the pool to the peace officer and credit the time
3939 to the peace officer.
4040 (g) A peace officer may only withdraw time from the
4141 legislative leave pool in coordination with and with the consent of
4242 the president or designee of the law enforcement association
4343 described in Subsection (e). A peace officer may not draw more than
4444 80 hours from the pool in a 160-hour work cycle and may not draw more
4545 than 480 hours from the pool in a fiscal year.
4646 (h) A peace officer shall use time from the legislative
4747 leave pool in accordance with rules adopted by the commission.
4848 SECTION 2. Section 402.009, Government Code, is amended to
4949 read as follows:
5050 Sec. 402.009. AUTHORITY TO EMPLOY AND COMMISSION PEACE
5151 OFFICERS. (a) The attorney general may employ and commission
5252 peace officers as investigators for the limited purpose of
5353 assisting the attorney general in carrying out the duties of that
5454 office relating to prosecution assistance and crime prevention.
5555 (b) The attorney general shall ensure that a commissioned
5656 peace officer employed as authorized under Subsection (a) is
5757 compensated according to Schedule C of the position classification
5858 salary schedule prescribed by the General Appropriations Act.
5959 SECTION 3. Section 659.301(5), Government Code, is amended
6060 to read as follows:
6161 (5) "State employee" means an individual who:
6262 (A) is a commissioned law enforcement officer of
6363 the Department of Public Safety, the Texas Facilities Commission,
6464 the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission, [or] the Texas Department
6565 of Criminal Justice, or the attorney general;
6666 (B) is a commissioned security officer of the
6767 comptroller;
6868 (C) is a law enforcement officer commissioned by
6969 the Parks and Wildlife Commission;
7070 (D) is a commissioned peace officer of an
7171 institution of higher education;
7272 (E) is an employee or official of the Board of
7373 Pardons and Paroles or the parole division of the Texas Department
7474 of Criminal Justice if the employee or official has routine direct
7575 contact with inmates of any penal or correctional institution or
7676 with administratively released prisoners subject to the board's
7777 jurisdiction;
7878 (F) has been certified to the Employees
7979 Retirement System of Texas under Section 815.505 as having begun
8080 employment as a law enforcement officer or custodial officer,
8181 unless the individual has been certified to the system as having
8282 ceased employment as a law enforcement officer or custodial
8383 officer; or
8484 (G) before May 29, 1987, received hazardous duty
8585 pay based on the terms of any state law if the individual holds a
8686 position designated under that law as eligible for the pay.
8787 SECTION 4. Section 661.918(a), Government Code, is amended
8888 to read as follows:
8989 (a) This section applies to a peace officer under Article
9090 2.12, Code of Criminal Procedure, who is commissioned as a law
9191 enforcement officer or agent, including a ranger, by:
9292 (1) the Public Safety Commission and the director of
9393 the Department of Public Safety;
9494 (2) the Parks and Wildlife Commission; [or]
9595 (3) the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission; or
9696 (4) the attorney general.
9797 SECTION 5. Subchapter B, Chapter 11, Parks and Wildlife
9898 Code, is amended by adding Section 11.0183 to read as follows:
9999 Sec. 11.0183. DONATION OF ACCRUED COMPENSATORY TIME OR
100100 ACCRUED ANNUAL LEAVE FOR LEGISLATIVE PURPOSES. (a) The director
101101 shall allow a peace officer employed by the department to
102102 voluntarily transfer to a legislative leave pool up to eight hours
103103 of compensatory time or annual leave per year earned by the peace
104104 officer.
105105 (b) The director or the director's designee shall
106106 administer the legislative leave pool.
107107 (c) The commission shall adopt rules and prescribe
108108 procedures relating to the operation of the legislative leave pool.
109109 (d) The director or the director's designee shall credit the
110110 legislative leave pool with the amount of time contributed by a
111111 peace officer and deduct a corresponding amount of time from the
112112 peace officer's earned compensatory time or annual leave as if the
113113 peace officer had used the time for personal purposes.
114114 (e) A peace officer is entitled to use time contributed to
115115 the legislative leave pool if the peace officer uses the time for
116116 legislative leave on behalf of a law enforcement association of at
117117 least 350 active or retired members governed by a board of
118118 directors.
119119 (f) The director or the director's designee shall transfer
120120 time from the pool to the peace officer and credit the time to the
121121 peace officer.
122122 (g) A peace officer may only withdraw time from the
123123 legislative leave pool in coordination with and with the consent of
124124 the president or designee of the law enforcement association
125125 described in Subsection (e). A peace officer may not draw more than
126126 80 hours from the pool in a 160-hour work cycle and may not draw more
127127 than 480 hours from the pool in a fiscal year.
128128 (h) A peace officer shall use time from the legislative
129129 leave pool in accordance with rules adopted by the commission.
130130 SECTION 6. (a) The classification officer in the office of
131131 the state auditor shall classify the position of commissioned peace
132132 officer employed as an investigator by the Office of the Attorney
133133 General as a Schedule C position under the Texas Position
134134 Classification Plan, 1961.
135135 (b) The change made by the classification officer as
136136 required by this section applies beginning in the state fiscal
137137 biennium beginning September 1, 2015.
138138 (c) This section expires September 1, 2017.
139139 SECTION 7. Section 661.918(a), Government Code, as amended
140140 by this Act, applies only to an injury that occurs on or after the
141141 effective date of this Act.
142142 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
143143 * * * * *