LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1369
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1369
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1369
Compare Versions
SB1369 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1369 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1369 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB1369 Comm Sub May 23, 2015
SB1369 Engrossed April 21, 2015
SB1369 Comm Sub April 15, 2015
SB1369 Introduced March 12, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB1369 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1369 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1369 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB1369 Comm Sub May 23, 2015
SB1369 Engrossed April 21, 2015
SB1369 Comm Sub April 15, 2015
SB1369 Introduced March 12, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare