E | 05/23/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/23/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2026 | |
E | 05/14/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1613 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3545 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1593 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1613 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1567 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Record vote | RV#993 | Journal Page: 3279 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3279 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3279 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3247 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3246 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 3048 | Journal Page: 3246 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 2672 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2672 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2477 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1093 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 492 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 492 | |
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |