Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1394 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hancock S.B. No. 1394
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 13, 2015,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 14, Nays 0; April 13, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1394 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the presentation of evidence in appraisal review board
 hearings on protests.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.45, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subsection (h) and adding Subsection (o) to read as follows:
 (h)  Before the hearing on a protest or immediately after the
 hearing begins, the chief appraiser and the property owner or the
 owner's agent shall each provide the other with a copy of any
 written material or material preserved on any portable device
 designed to maintain an electronic, magnetic, or digital
 reproduction of a document or image that the person intends to offer
 or submit to the appraisal review board at the hearing.
 (o)  The appraisal office shall provide audiovisual
 equipment at each hearing on a protest for use during the hearing by
 the property owner or the property owner's agent. The audiovisual
 equipment must be of the same general type, kind, and character as
 the equipment used by the chief appraiser at a protest hearing.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *