LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1394
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1394
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1394
Compare Versions
SB1394 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1394 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1394 Enrolled May 28, 2015
SB1394 Comm Sub May 15, 2015
SB1394 Engrossed April 20, 2015
SB1394 Comm Sub April 13, 2015
SB1394 Introduced March 12, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB1394 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1394 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1394 Enrolled May 28, 2015
SB1394 Comm Sub May 15, 2015
SB1394 Engrossed April 20, 2015
SB1394 Comm Sub April 13, 2015
SB1394 Introduced March 12, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare