House | 05/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4468 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 4335 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4335 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4215 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2026 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1874 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1874 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1874 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1874 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1873 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1873 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1873 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1941 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1845 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1722 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 707 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 493 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 493 | |
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |