E
|
05/29/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3579
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1119
|
Journal Page: 3578
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3578
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3578
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3552
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3552
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 85
|
Journal Page: 3552
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1338
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 623
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 623
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 623
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 623
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 623
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 623
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 623
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 453
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 133
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 133
|
Senate
|
11/10/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2014
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|