Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1407 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 1407
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 March 30, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; March 30, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to encouraging age-appropriate normalcy activities for
 children in the managing conservatorship of the state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 263.001(a), Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subdivision (1-a) and adding Subdivision (1-b) to read as
 follows:
 (1-a)  "Age-appropriate normalcy activity" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 264.001.
 (1-b)  "Department" means the Department of Family and
 Protective Services.
 SECTION 2.  Section 263.306, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  In addition to the requirements of Subsection (a), at
 each permanency hearing the court shall review the department's
 efforts to ensure that the child has regular, ongoing opportunities
 to engage in age-appropriate normalcy activities, including
 activities not listed in the child's service plan.
 SECTION 3.  Section 263.503, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  In addition to the requirements of Subsection (a), at
 each placement review hearing the court shall review the
 department's efforts to ensure that the child has regular, ongoing
 opportunities to engage in age-appropriate normalcy activities,
 including activities not listed in the child's service plan.
 SECTION 4.  Section 264.001, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subdivision (1) and adding Subdivisions (1-a) and (5) to
 read as follows:
 (1)  "Age-appropriate normalcy activity" means an
 activity or experience:
 (A)  that is generally accepted as suitable for a
 child's age or level of maturity or that is determined to be
 developmentally appropriate for a child based on the development of
 cognitive, emotional, physical, and behavioral capacities that are
 typical for the age or age group; and
 (B)  in which a child who is not in the
 conservatorship of the state is generally allowed to participate,
 including extracurricular activities, in-school and out-of-school
 social activities, cultural and enrichment activities, and
 employment opportunities.
 (1-a)  "Department" means the Department of Family and
 Protective Services.
 (5)  "Standard of care of a reasonable and prudent
 parent" means the standard of care that a parent of reasonable
 judgment, skill, and caution would exercise in addressing the
 health, safety, and welfare of a child while encouraging the
 emotional and developmental growth of the child, taking into
 consideration:
 (A)  the overall health and safety of the child;
 (B)  the child's age, maturity, and development
 level;
 (C)  the best interest of the child based on the
 caregiver's knowledge of the child;
 (D)  the appropriateness of a proposed activity
 and any potential risk factors;
 (E)  the behavioral history of the child and the
 child's ability to safely participate in a proposed activity;
 (F)  the importance of encouraging the child's
 social, emotional, and developmental growth; and
 (G)  the importance of providing the child with
 the most family-like living experience possible.
 SECTION 5.  The heading to Section 264.114, Family Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 264.114.  IMMUNITY FROM LIABILITY; ADVERSE
 DEPARTMENTAL ACTION PROHIBITED.
 SECTION 6.  Section 264.114, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows:
 (c)  A foster parent, other substitute caregiver, family
 relative or other designated caregiver, or licensed child placing
 agency caring for a child in the managing conservatorship of the
 department is not liable for harm caused to the child resulting from
 the child's participation in an age-appropriate normalcy activity
 approved by the caregiver if, in approving the child's
 participation in the activity, the caregiver exercised the standard
 of care of a reasonable and prudent parent.
 (d)  A licensed child placing agency is not subject to
 adverse action by the department, including contractual action or
 licensing or other regulatory action, arising out of the conduct of
 a foster parent who has exercised the standard of care of a
 reasonable and prudent parent.
 SECTION 7.  Subchapter B, Chapter 264, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 264.125 to read as follows:
 Sec. 264.125.  AGE-APPROPRIATE NORMALCY ACTIVITIES;
 STANDARD OF CARE. (a)  The department shall use its best efforts to
 normalize the lives of children in the managing conservatorship of
 the department by allowing substitute caregivers, without the
 department's prior approval, to make decisions similar to those a
 parent would be entitled to make regarding a child's participation
 in age-appropriate normalcy activities.
 (b)  In determining whether to allow a child in the managing
 conservatorship of the department to participate in an activity, a
 substitute caregiver must exercise the standard of care of a
 reasonable and prudent parent.
 (c)  The department shall adopt and implement policies
 consistent with this section promoting a substitute caregiver's
 ability to make decisions described by Subsection (a). The
 department shall identify and review any departmental policy or
 procedure that may impede a substitute caregiver's ability to make
 such decisions.
 (d)  The department shall require licensed child placing
 agency personnel, residential child care licensing staff,
 conservatorship caseworkers, and other persons as may be determined
 by the department to complete a course of training regarding:
 (1)  the importance of a child's participation in
 age-appropriate normalcy activities and the benefits of such
 activities to a child's well-being, mental health, and social,
 emotional, and developmental growth; and
 (2)  substitute caregiver decision-making under the
 standard of care of a reasonable and prudent parent.
 SECTION 8.  The changes in law made by this Act to Sections
 263.306 and 263.503, Family Code, apply only to a permanency
 hearing or a placement review hearing conducted under Chapter 263,
 Family Code, on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 permanency hearing or a placement review hearing conducted before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on
 the date the hearing was conducted, and the former law is continued
 in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *