Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB142 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 142


 AN ACT
 relating to the appointment and training of volunteer deputy
 registrars.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 13, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 13.048 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.048.  OPTIONAL PROCEDURE FOR APPOINTMENT OF
 VOLUNTEER DEPUTY REGISTRAR; PROVISION OF TRAINING MATERIALS ON
 SECRETARY OF STATE WEBSITE. (a)  A county may adopt a method of
 appointment for volunteer deputy registrars prescribed by the
 secretary of state or developed by the county and approved by the
 secretary of state under this section that provides for the
 training and examination of potential volunteer deputy registrars.
 (b)  For the purposes of this section, the secretary of state
 shall:
 (1)  provide on the secretary of state's website the
 training materials prescribed by the secretary of state under
 Section 13.047 for volunteer deputy registrars; and
 (2)  prescribe and make available on the secretary of
 state's website an examination based on those materials.
 (c)  A county that has adopted the method under this section:
 (1)  shall administer the required examination to a
 potential volunteer deputy registrar at any time during the county
 voter registrar's regular business hours; and
 (2)  is not required to hold in-person training
 sessions for potential volunteer deputy registrars.
 (d)  At the time a person satisfactorily completes the
 examination in compliance with standards adopted by the secretary
 of state, the registrar shall appoint the person as a volunteer
 deputy registrar and advise the person:
 (1)  of county-specific procedures for processing
 voter registration applications, if applicable; and
 (2)  that the only requirements for voter registration
 are those prescribed by state law or by the secretary of state.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 142 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 142 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 134,
 Nays 10, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor