LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB142
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB142
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB142
Compare Versions
SB142 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB142 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB142 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB142 Comm Sub May 11, 2015
SB142 Engrossed April 30, 2015
SB142 Comm Sub April 28, 2015
SB142 Introduced November 10, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB142 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB142 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB142 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB142 Comm Sub May 11, 2015
SB142 Engrossed April 30, 2015
SB142 Comm Sub April 28, 2015
SB142 Introduced November 10, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare