By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1436 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 18, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation; April 7, 2015, rereferred to Committee on Intergovernmental Relations; April 29, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 1; April 29, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the setback requirements for a junkyard or an automotive wrecking and salvage yard. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 396.022(a), Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) A junkyard or an automotive wrecking and salvage yard may not be located: (1) within 50 feet of the right-of-way of a public street or[,] state highway;[,] or (2) within 50 feet of the nearest property line of a residence. SECTION 2. Section 396.022(a), Transportation Code, as amended by this Act, applies only to a junkyard or an automotive wrecking and salvage yard that begins operating on or after the effective date of this Act. A junkyard or an automotive wrecking and salvage yard operating before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law applicable immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *