Senate | 05/13/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1092 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 619 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 619 | |
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |