Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1441 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Eltife S.B. No. 1441
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 8, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to standards for elevators, escalators, and related
 equipment; authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 754.014(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission by rule shall adopt standards for the
 installation, maintenance, alteration, operation, testing, removal
 from service, and inspection of equipment used by the public in:
 (1)  buildings owned or operated by the state, a
 state-owned institution or agency, or a political subdivision of
 the state; and
 (2)  buildings that contain equipment that is open to
 the general public, including a hotel, motel, apartment house,
 boardinghouse, church, office building, shopping center, or other
 commercial establishment.
 SECTION 2.  Section 754.015, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c-1) and amending Subsection (d) to
 read as follows:
 (c-1)  The commission by rule may adopt requirements for
 inspection and certification of equipment that is transferred to
 another person.
 (d)  The executive director may charge a reasonable fee as
 set by the commission for:
 (1)  registering or renewing registration of an
 elevator inspector;
 (2)  registering or renewing registration of a
 contractor;
 (3)  applying for a certificate of compliance;
 (4)  filing an inspection report as required by Section
 754.019(a)(3), 30 days or more after the date the report is due, for
 each day the report remains not filed after the date the report is
 due;
 (5)  submitting for review plans for the installation
 or alteration of equipment;
 (6)  reviewing and approving continuing education
 providers and courses for renewal of elevator inspector and
 contractor registrations;
 (7)  applying for a waiver, new technology variance, or
 delay; [and]
 (8)  attending a continuing education program
 sponsored by the department for registered elevator inspectors; and
 (9)  applying to remove equipment from service.
 SECTION 3.  Section 754.019(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The owner shall:
 (1)  have the equipment inspected annually by a
 registered elevator inspector, unless the equipment has been
 removed from service in accordance with commission rules;
 (2)  obtain an inspection report from the inspector
 evidencing that all equipment in a building on the real property was
 inspected in accordance with this chapter and rules adopted under
 this chapter;
 (3)  file with the executive director each inspection
 report, and all applicable fees, not later than the 30th calendar
 day after the date on which an inspection is made under this
 chapter;
 (4)  display the certificate of compliance for the
 equipment in a publicly visible area as defined by commission rule;
 and
 (5)  maintain the equipment in compliance with the
 standards and codes adopted under commission rules.
 SECTION 4.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall
 adopt the rules necessary to implement the changes in law made by
 this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *