Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1442 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Eltife S.B. No. 1442
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 8, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the standards for boiler inspection agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 755.032(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission may adopt and enforce rules, in
 accordance with standard boiler usage, for the construction,
 inspection, installation, use, maintenance, repair, alteration,
 and operation of boilers.  The commission may adopt standards for an
 inspection agency to be authorized by the department to provide
 inspections under this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *