Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1444 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Taylor of Galveston S.B. No. 1444
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and
 Economic Development; April 22, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1; April 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to liability of certain electric utilities that allow
 certain uses of land that the electric utility owns, occupies, or
 leases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 75.0022(b), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a cause of action that accrues on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A cause of action that accrues before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law applicable to the cause of action
 immediately before that date, and that law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *