E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3622
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5695
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3448
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3448
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3448
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3448
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2668
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1556
|
Journal Page: 4816
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4816
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4816
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4792
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Bohac
|
Journal Page: 4792
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4792
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2341
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2341
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1496
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 672
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 508
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 508
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|