8 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 5 | | relating to the appointment and terms of the board of hospital |
---|
10 | 6 | | managers of the Dallas County Hospital District. |
---|
11 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 281, Health and Safety |
---|
13 | 9 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 281.0211 to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 10 | | Sec. 281.0211. APPOINTMENT OF DALLAS COUNTY HOSPITAL |
---|
15 | 11 | | DISTRICT BOARD; MEMBERS' TERMS. (a) The Dallas County Hospital |
---|
16 | 12 | | District is governed by a board composed of 11 members, appointed as |
---|
17 | 13 | | follows: |
---|
18 | 14 | | (1) the Dallas County Commissioners Court shall |
---|
19 | 15 | | appoint one member; |
---|
20 | 16 | | (2) each commissioner on the Dallas County |
---|
21 | 17 | | Commissioners Court shall appoint two members; and |
---|
22 | 18 | | (3) the county judge of Dallas County shall appoint |
---|
23 | 19 | | two members. |
---|
24 | 20 | | (b) Board members appointed under this section serve |
---|
25 | 21 | | staggered three-year terms, with as near as possible to one-third |
---|
26 | 22 | | of the members' terms expiring each year. |
---|
27 | 23 | | (c) On or after September 1, 2022, the Dallas County |
---|
28 | 24 | | Commissioners Court shall appoint members to the board in |
---|
29 | 25 | | accordance with Sections 281.021(a) and 281.022(a). |
---|
30 | 26 | | (d) Subsection (c) does not affect the entitlement of a |
---|
31 | 27 | | member of the board of the Dallas County Hospital District |
---|
32 | 28 | | appointed to the board under this section before September 1, 2022, |
---|
33 | 29 | | to continue to carry out the member's functions for the remainder of |
---|
34 | 30 | | the member's term. |
---|
35 | 31 | | (e) On the expiration of the terms of the board members |
---|
36 | 32 | | described by Subsection (d), the Dallas County Commissioners Court |
---|
37 | 33 | | shall take appropriate action to ensure that, as soon as possible, |
---|
38 | 34 | | the board of the Dallas County Hospital District complies with the |
---|
39 | 35 | | requirements of Sections 281.021(a) and 281.022(a). |
---|
40 | 36 | | SECTION 2. (a) The members of the board of hospital |
---|
41 | 37 | | managers of the Dallas County Hospital District serving on the |
---|
42 | 38 | | effective date of this Act may draw lots or use another method to |
---|
43 | 39 | | determine the members, the number of whom must be as near as |
---|
44 | 40 | | possible to one-third of the total number of members, who shall |
---|
45 | 41 | | serve terms that expire in 2018, the members, the number of whom |
---|
46 | 42 | | must be as near as possible to one-third of the total number of |
---|
47 | 43 | | members, who shall serve terms that expire in 2017, and the members, |
---|
48 | 44 | | the number of whom must be as near as possible to one-third of the |
---|
49 | 45 | | total number of members, who shall serve terms that expire in 2016. |
---|
50 | 46 | | The members of the board appointed to succeed the members serving on |
---|
51 | 47 | | the effective date of this Act shall serve three-year terms. |
---|
52 | 48 | | (b) At the time the terms of the board of hospital managers |
---|
53 | 49 | | of the Dallas County Hospital District are determined under |
---|
54 | 50 | | Subsection (a) of this section, the Dallas County Commissioners |
---|
55 | 51 | | Court shall establish the specific date on which the terms of |
---|
56 | 52 | | members of the board of hospital managers shall expire each year. |
---|
57 | 53 | | (c) The additional members of the board of hospital managers |
---|
58 | 54 | | of the Dallas County Hospital District required by Section |
---|
59 | 55 | | 281.0211, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, must be |
---|
60 | 56 | | appointed not later than January 1, 2016. |
---|
61 | 57 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
62 | 58 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
63 | 59 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
64 | 60 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
65 | 61 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
| 62 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 63 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 64 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1461 passed the Senate on |
---|
| 65 | + | April 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that |
---|
| 66 | + | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2015, by the |
---|
| 67 | + | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 68 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 69 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 70 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1461 passed the House, with |
---|
| 71 | + | amendment, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 135, |
---|
| 72 | + | Nays 5, two present not voting. |
---|
| 73 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 74 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 75 | + | Approved: |
---|
| 76 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 77 | + | Date |
---|
| 78 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 79 | + | Governor |
---|