LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1465
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1465
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1465
Compare Versions
SB1465 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1465 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1465 Enrolled June 1, 2015
SB1465 Comm Sub May 14, 2015
SB1465 Engrossed April 13, 2015
SB1465 Comm Sub April 8, 2015
SB1465 Introduced March 12, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB1465 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1465 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1465 Enrolled June 1, 2015
SB1465 Comm Sub May 14, 2015
SB1465 Engrossed April 13, 2015
SB1465 Comm Sub April 8, 2015
SB1465 Introduced March 12, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare