E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
05/26/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2404
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4361
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1396
|
Journal Page: 4361
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4361
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4361
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4285
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4285
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1211
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1211
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1211
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1211
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1211
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1211
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1211
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 508
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 508
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|