E | 06/19/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3648 | |
E | 05/30/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3592 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5692 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3503 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3439 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2665 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Record vote | RV#1556 | Journal Page: 4815 |
House | 05/27/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 4815 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4815 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4782 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4782 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4217 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2340 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2340 | |
House | 03/25/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1029 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 579 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 579 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 579 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 579 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 579 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 579 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 579 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 513 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 207 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 134 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 134 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |