E | 05/23/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/23/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2026 | |
E | 05/14/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1613 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3545 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1593 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1613 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1557 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3137 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#919 | Journal Page: 3138 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3138 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3138 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3120 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3120 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3367 | Journal Page: 3120 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3266 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2341 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2341 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1630 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 934 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 934 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 934 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 934 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 934 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 934 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 934 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 509 | |
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 509 | |
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |