E
|
05/11/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/11/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1505
|
E
|
04/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2135
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1219
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1195
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1195
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1195
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1190
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1061
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1789
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#315
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Amended
|
2-Capriglione
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1779
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1779
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Amended
|
4-Deshotel
|
Journal Page: 1779
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1778
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1551
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1364
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1364
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 856
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 502
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 434
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 434
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 434
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 433
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 433
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 433
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 433
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA4 Watson
|
Journal Page: 432
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 431
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 431
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 451
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 419
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 383
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 134
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 134
|
Senate
|
11/10/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2014
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|