Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1502 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Garcia S.B. No. 1502
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 23, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 2; April 23, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1502 By:  Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to county regulation of the removal and storage in certain
 counties of unlawfully stopped motor vehicles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 545.306, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 545.306.  REGULATION OF TOWING COMPANIES IN CERTAIN
 COUNTIES. (a)  The commissioners court of a county with a
 population of 3.3 million or more shall by order [ordinance]
 provide for the licensing of or the granting of a permit to a person
 to remove or store a vehicle authorized by Section 545.305 to be
 removed in an unincorporated area of the county.
 (b)  The commissioners court of a county with a population of
 3.3 million or more may by order provide for a person to remove or
 store a vehicle that is authorized by Section 545.305 to be removed
 and is located in the corporate boundaries of a municipality in the
 county only if the county has entered into an interlocal agreement
 with the municipality for that purpose.
 (c)  An order under Subsection (a) or (b) [The ordinance]
 must include rules to ensure the protection of the public and the
 safe and efficient operation of towing and storage services in the
 county and may not regulate or restrict the use of lighting
 equipment more than the extent allowed by state and federal law.
 The sheriff shall determine the rules included in the order
 [ordinance] with the review and consent of the commissioners court.
 (d)  For an order under Subsection (a), the [(b)  The]
 commissioners court shall set the fee for the license or permit in
 an amount that reasonably offsets the costs of enforcing the order
 [ordinance].  The commissioners court shall use each license or
 permit fee to pay salaries and expenses of the sheriff's office for
 conducting inspections to determine compliance with the order
 [ordinance] and laws relating to dealers in scrap metal and
 salvage.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *