E | 06/17/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/17/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3647 | |
E | 05/29/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3440 | |
House | 05/29/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5564 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2862 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3102 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2408 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Record vote | RV#1518 | Journal Page: 4682 |
House | 05/26/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 4682 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4682 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4530 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4530 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4343 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2672 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2672 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2477 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1094 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 528 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 528 | |
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |