House | 05/08/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2446 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2446 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2267 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1093 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 529 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 529 | |
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |