Senate | 05/07/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1435 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1391 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1027 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 530 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 530 | |
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |