Senate | 05/12/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1542 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 419 | |
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 310 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |