E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5208
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2743
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2743
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2743
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2741
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4359
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1394
|
Journal Page: 4359
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4359
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4359
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4285
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4285
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2142
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1001
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 532
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 532
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|