Senate | 05/06/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1391 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1338 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 707 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 532 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 532 | |
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |