Senate | 04/28/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 532 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 532 | |
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |